EP3425269 - LIGHT-TYPE CONVERSION DRIVING DEVICE FOR CAR LAMP LIGHT-TYPE CONVERSION DEVICE AND CONVERSION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hasco Vision Technology Co., Ltd. 767 Yecheng Road Jiading District Shanghai 201821 / CN | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Shijie 767 Yecheng Road Jiading District Shanghai 201821 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Minghua 767 Yecheng Road Jiading District Shanghai 201821 / CN | 03 /
GE, Bin 767 Yecheng Road Jiading District Shanghai 201821 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Yujie 767 Yecheng Road Jiading District Shanghai 201821 / CN | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16892147.6 | 29.03.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016CN77618 | Priority number, date | CN201610116184 | 01.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610116184 | [2019/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017147956 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425269 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F21S41/689, F21V14/08, B60Q1/14 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
F21S41/689 (EP,US);
H02K1/22 (CN,US);
B60Q1/1438 (US);
B60Q1/14 (EP,CN,US);
F21V14/08 (EP,US);
H01F13/003 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | F21V14/08, B60Q1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG DER LICHTTYPUMWANDLUNG FÜR AUTOSCHEINWERFERLICHTTYPUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND UMWANDLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/02] | English: | LIGHT-TYPE CONVERSION DRIVING DEVICE FOR CAR LAMP LIGHT-TYPE CONVERSION DEVICE AND CONVERSION METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CONVERSION DU TYPE DE LUMIÈRE POUR DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DU TYPE DE LUMIÈRE DE LAMPE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION CORRESPONDANT | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2018 | Translation filed | 28.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 27.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/35] | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6249065 (OUDET CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 2 * column 1, lines 8,9,53-63; figures 1a-4b * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, lines 20-55 *; | [A]DE10334553 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,8,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0009] - [0016] - [0023]; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]DE102004025228 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0018] - [0027]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,8; | [A]CH697140 (SAIA BURGESS MURTEN AG [CH]) [A] 1,8* paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0012] - [0019] - [0028]; figures 1-7 *; | [YA]DE102008022508 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN [DE]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0032] - [0043]; figures 1-9 * [A] 1,8; | [IY]EP2894064 (SHANGHAI KOITO AUTOMOTIVE LAMP [CN]) [I] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0018] - [0024]; figures 1-6; claim 3 * [Y] 2-6,9,10; | [Y]WO2015162557 (MMT AG [CH]) [Y] 3,5,6 * page 1, lines 3,4 * * page 5, lines 12-17,25-28 * * page 6, lines 4,5 * * figures 1a,2 *; | [Y]CN105262253 (SHANGHAI JIANDONG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 4 * see attached machine translation;; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]CN1884906 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102759031 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [A]CN102848969 (SHANGHAI KOITO AUTOMOTIVE LAMP) [A] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0034]-[0043], and figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN105262253 (SHANGHAI JIANDONG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2016053959 (KIM JAE HONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [E]CN105656230 (SHANGHAI KOITO AUTOMOTIVE LAMP) [E] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0006]-[0150], and figures 1-16 * | by applicant | CN201089421Y | CN201462690U |