EP3424768 - TRAIN CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-8585 / JP | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Junko c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
IBA, Satoshi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Yohei c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
MIYAJIMA, Yasuyuki c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 16892750.7 | 27.12.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016JP88933 | Priority number, date | JP20160041195 | 03.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016041195 | [2019/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149916 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424768 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3424768 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60L7/18, B60L15/40, B60L15/20 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B60L7/18 (EP,KR);
B61L15/0072 (KR);
B60L15/2009 (EP);
B60L15/40 (EP);
B61H11/14 (KR);
B61L25/021 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | B60L7/18, B60L15/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/02] | English: | TRAIN CONTROL DEVICE | [2019/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE TRAIN | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2018 | Translation filed | 30.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | LU | 27.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006074876 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2006292625 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2010098821 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2010098849 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013325224 (YAMAMOTO JUNKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]JP2016019411 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2006074876 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 6-7 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0040]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2006292625 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0029] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010098821 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0043]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010098849 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraphs [0018], [0021] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016019411 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7* , entire text; all drawings & GB 2529294 A entire text; all drawings & DE 102015212847 A1 & CN 105270445 A * |