Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017151025 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016SE50164 | 02.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10652400 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2020 | B2 | US2019082057 | 14.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016SE50164 | 02.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3424231 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2020 | B1 | EP3424231 | 11.09.2019 | A4 | EP3424231 | 09.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016SE50164 | 02.03.2016 |