EP3424231 - A METHOD AND A BASE STATION FOR CONTROLLING USER DATA TRAFFIC BETWEEN THE WIRELESS DEVICE AND A LOCAL CLOUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/02] | A BASE STATION, A WIRELESS DEVICE, AND METHODS THEREIN FOR CONTROLLING USER DATA TRAFFIC BETWEEN THE WIRELESS DEVICE AND A LOCAL CLOUD | ||
[2020/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTBERG, Lars Långtora Grän 11 SE-745 96 Enköping / SE | 02 /
ERIKSSON, Hans Runskogsvägen 44 SE-192 48 Sollentuna / SE | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 16892826.5 | 02.03.2016 | [2019/02] | WO2016SE50164 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017151025 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424231 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3424231 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/24, H04L12/14, H04L29/08, H04W88/08, H04M15/00, H04W8/08, H04W36/00, H04W76/15 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H04M15/852 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L12/1407 (US);
H04L67/1008 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04M15/8214 (EP,US);
H04M15/853 (EP,US);
H04M15/88 (EP,US);
H04W36/0022 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | H04W4/24, H04L12/14, H04L29/08, H04W88/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION ZUR STEUERUNG DES BENUTZERDATENVERKEHRS ZWISCHEN DER DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG UND EINER LOKALEN CLOUD | [2020/19] | English: | A METHOD AND A BASE STATION FOR CONTROLLING USER DATA TRAFFIC BETWEEN THE WIRELESS DEVICE AND A LOCAL CLOUD | [2020/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET STATION DE BASE POUR COMMANDER UN TRAFIC DE DONNÉES D'UTILISATEUR ENTRE LE DISPOSITIF SANS FIL ET UN NUAGE LOCAL | [2020/19] |
Former [2019/02] | BASISSTATION, DRAHTLOSE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DARIN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BENUTZERDATENVERKEHRS ZWISCHEN DER DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG UND EINER LOKALEN CLOUD | ||
Former [2019/02] | A BASE STATION, A WIRELESS DEVICE, AND METHODS THEREIN FOR CONTROLLING USER DATA TRAFFIC BETWEEN THE WIRELESS DEVICE AND A LOCAL CLOUD | ||
Former [2019/02] | STATION DE BASE, DISPOSITIF SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS POUR COMMANDER UN TRAFIC DE DONNÉES D'UTILISATEUR ENTRE LE DISPOSITIF SANS FIL ET UN NUAGE LOCAL | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 16.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2016 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | ES | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | IT | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | MT | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | IE | 02.03.2021 | LU | 02.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.03.2016 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
MK | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 02.03.2016 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2021 | ||
LU | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
ES | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
IT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2538719 (VODAFONE IP LICENSING LTD [GB]); | International search | [A]US2009232019 (GUPTA RAJARSHI [US], et al); | [X]EP2538719 (VODAFONE IP LICENSING LTD [GB]); | [A]US2014043984 (BILLAU RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]US2015181592 (BINDRIM WALTER [GB], et al) | Examination | US2015156082 | by applicant | EP2538719 | US9071450 | US9173081 |