EP3343907 - TELEVISION MAINBOARD DEVICE, CONNECTION DEVICE, TELEVISION, AND TELEVISION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heyi Intelligent Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. 6F Tower B World Trade Center No.36 North Third Ring Road Dongcheng District Beijing 100029 / CN | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Tingming 6F, Tower B World Trade Center No.36 North Third RingRoad Dongcheng District Beijing 100029 / CN | 02 /
SU, Wenhua 6F, Tower B World Trade Center No.36 North Third Ring Road Dongcheng District Beijing 100029 / CN | 03 /
AN, Shenhua 6F, Tower B World Trade Center No.36 North Third Ring Road Dongcheng District Beijing 100029 / CN | 04 /
YAO, Jian 6F, Tower B World Trade Center No.36 North Third Ring Road Dongcheng District Beijing 100029 / CN | 05 /
PAN, Baiyu 6F, Tower B World Trade Center No.36 North Third Ring Road Dongcheng District Beijing 100029 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Ji 6F, Tower B World Trade Center No.36 North Third Ring Road Dongcheng District Beijing 100029 / CN | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16893251.5 | 12.09.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016CN98653 | Priority number, date | CN201610127714 | 07.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610127714 | [2018/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017152606 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343907 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343907 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/64, H04N5/63, H04N21/443 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
H04N5/64 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N5/655 (US);
H04N21/443 (US);
H04N5/63 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | H04N5/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TV-HAUPTPLATINE, ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG, TV UND TV-SYSTEM | [2018/27] | English: | TELEVISION MAINBOARD DEVICE, CONNECTION DEVICE, TELEVISION, AND TELEVISION SYSTEM | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CARTE MÈRE DE TÉLÉVISEUR, DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION, TÉLÉVISEUR ET SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉVISEUR | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2018 | Translation filed | 26.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 26.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2016 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 12.09.2016 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.09.2016 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004165119 (CHOI NAM SU [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0032] - [0043] - [0050] - [0056]; figures 3-8 *; | [X]US2008239229 (PARK JIN-KYU [KR], et al) [X] 5-7 * paragraphs [0018] , [0027] - [0028] - [0035] - [0039] - [0045] , [0049]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2011069055 (JUNG SUNG SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017] - [0047] - [0049]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2011317076 (CHEN YILKONG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0043] - [0049] - [0055]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2613250 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0026] , [0039] - [0044] - [0049] - [0054] - [0178] , [0179]; figures 1-4,6-10,12-23; claim 4 * | International search | [A]JP3259219B (MOLEX INC. et al.) [A] 1-37 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101068319 (BEIJING PAIRUIGEN SCIENCE & TE [CN]) [A] 1-37 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN102883199 (HONGFUJIN PREC IND SHENZHEN, et al) [Y] 1-12, 16-19, 21-30, 34-37 * , description, paragraphs [0012]-[0013] *; | [A]CN103888698 (SICHUAN CHANGHONG ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-37* , the whole document *; | [XY]CN104767949 (AMLOGIC INC) [X] 13-15, 20, 31-33 * , description, paragraphs [0054], [0059], [0075] and r00841, description, paragraphs [0054], [0059], [0075] and [0084] * [Y] 1-12, 16-19, 21-30, 34-37; | [PX]CN105681706 (1 VERGE INTELLIGENCE TECH (SHENZHEN) CO LTD) [PX] 1-37 * , claims 1-17, and description, paragraphs [0026]-[0040] and r00471-r00671 *; | [PX]CN105721805 (1 VERGE INTELLIGENCE TECH (SHENZHEN) CO LTD) [PX] 1-37 * , claims 1-10, and description, paragraphs [0008]-[0040] * |