EP3430908 - METHOD FOR PRESERVATION OF FRESH PLANTS BY VACUUM PRE-COOLING SYNCHRONOUSLY COMBINED WITH MODIFIED ATMOSPHERE TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states South China University Of Technology (SCUT) No. 381 Wushan Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510640 / CN | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Dawen No. 381 Wushan Road Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510640 / CN | 02 /
WU, Xinwei No. 381 Wushan Road Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510640 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Zhiwei No. 381 Wushan Road Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510640 / CN | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 16894216.7 | 08.12.2016 | [2019/04] | WO2016CN109042 | Priority number, date | CN201610157305 | 17.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610157305 | [2019/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017157057 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3430908 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/04, A23B7/148 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
A23B7/0425 (EP,US);
A23B7/04 (CN);
A23B7/148 (EP,CN,US);
A23V2002/00 (CN,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/10, A23V2250/126, A23V2250/11, A23V2250/124 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON FRISCHEN PFLANZEN MITTELS VAKUUMVORKÜHLUNG MIT SYNCHRONER KOMBINATION VON TECHNIK FÜR MODIFIZIERTE ATMOSPHÄRE | [2019/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PRESERVATION OF FRESH PLANTS BY VACUUM PRE-COOLING SYNCHRONOUSLY COMBINED WITH MODIFIED ATMOSPHERE TECHNIQUE | [2019/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONSERVATION DE PLANTES FRAÎCHES PAR UN PRÉ-REFROIDISSEMENT SOUS VIDE COMBINÉ DE FAÇON SYNCHRONE À UNE TECHNIQUE D'ATMOSPHÈRE MODIFIÉE | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2018 | Translation filed | 17.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPS60217858 ; | [IY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1985), vol. 1985, no. 50, Database accession no. 1985-313513, XP002794690 & JPS60217858 A 19851031 (ULVAC CORP) [I] 1-9 * abstract * [Y] 2 | [Y] - TAO FEI ET AL, "Preservation of mushroom in storage after vacuum cooling treatment**", INTERNATIONAL AGROPHYSICS, (20050101), vol. 19, pages 293 - 297, XP055204196 [Y] 2 * abstract * | [A] - OZTURK H M ET AL, "Effect of pressure on the vacuum cooling of iceberg lettuce", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRIGERATION, ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.IJREFRIG.2008.09.009, ISSN 0140-7007, (20090501), pages 402 - 410, (20081010), XP025980644 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijrefrig.2008.09.009 | [A] - SANDHYA, "Modified atmosphere packaging of fresh produce: Current status and future needs", LWT- FOOD SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, United Kingdom, (20100401), vol. 43, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.lwt.2009.05.018, ISSN 0023-6438, pages 381 - 392, XP055557513 [A] 1-9 * page 381 - page 386 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lwt.2009.05.018 |