EP3432769 - DEVICES AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A STIMULUS TO EVALUATE OCULAR SENSITIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brien Holden Vision Institute Level 4, Rupert Myers Building Barker Street University of New South Wales Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRMANN, Klaus 11/74-78 Crown Road Queenscliff, New South Wales 2096 / AU | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Holzwarth-Rochford, Andreas Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 16894817.2 | 24.03.2016 | [2019/05] | WO2016AU50216 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017161404 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3432769 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.09.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/02, A61M11/06, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61B3/10 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A61B3/10 (EP);
A61B3/0083 (EP,US);
A61B3/02 (US);
A61B3/132 (EP,US);
G02B27/0093 (US);
A61B5/4827 (EP);
A61B5/483 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/05] | A61B3/02, A61M11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES REIZES ZUR BEWERTUNG DER AUGENEMPFINDLICHKEIT | [2019/05] | English: | DEVICES AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A STIMULUS TO EVALUATE OCULAR SENSITIVITY | [2019/05] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN STIMULUS POUR ÉVALUER UNE SENSIBILITÉ OCULAIRE | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5230347 (WEINSTEIN CURT [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 5, lines 34-38 * * column 6, lines 58-66 * * figures 1, 6 *; | [XY]WO2004028421 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 47] * * figure 4 * [Y] 2; | [XY]US2004204674 (ANDERSON DARYL E [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0026] - [0047] * * paragraph [0068] * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 2; | [XY]US2011106025 (HALL GARY S [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] * * figure 3 * [Y] 2; | [E]EP3397136 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US]) [E] 8 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 17] - [0018] ** figure 6 * | International search | [A]US5230347 (WEINSTEIN CURT [US], et al) [A] 0; | [A]US2004039355 (GONZALEZ JOSE M [US], et al)[A] 0; | [X]US2005001981 (ANDERSON DARYL E [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-9, 12-18, 20-28, 30, 32, 33 * paragraphs 6, 28, 43 to 45, 65, 75 *; | [X]US2009212133 (COLLINS JR JAMES F [US]) [X] 1, 3-5, 7-11, 13, 20-22, 26, 27, 30, 32 * paragraphs 109, 110, 128, 158, 159, 322, 34l *; | [X]US2011106025 (HALL GARY S [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 7-9, 13, 18, 20-24, 26, 27, 29-33 * paragraphs 15, 17, 22, 28, 29, 31, 41, 44, 45 *; | [X] - VESALUOMA et al., "Effects of Oleoresin Capsicum Pepper Spray on Human Corneal Morphology and Sensitivity", Investigative Ophthalmology & Visual Science, (20000700), vol. 41, no. 8, pages 2138 - 2147, XP055426155 [X] 1, 2, 7, 13, 20, 33, 35-37, 41, 43, 46-48, 52, 54-58, 60-62, 66 * pages 2138 to 2140 * |