Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017166076 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN77734 | 29.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10491804 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2019 | B2 | US2019208131 | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN77734 | 29.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107439005B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2020 | B | CN107439005 | 05.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN77734 | 29.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3429185 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2023 | B1 | EP3429185 | 19.06.2019 | A4 | EP3429185 | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN77734 | 29.03.2016 |