EP3441603 - GAS TUBE FOR EGR COOLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korens Co., Ltd. Eogok-dong 116, Eogokgongdan-ro Yangsan-si Gyeongsangnam-do 50591 / KR | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Hyung Geun (Haeundae IPARK U-dong) 7009ho T2, 38, Marine city 2-ro, Haeundae-gu Busan 48120 / KR | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2019/07] | Application number, filing date | 16898024.1 | 08.07.2016 | [2019/07] | WO2016KR07455 | Priority number, date | KR20160042371 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: KR 20160042371 | [2019/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175920 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441603 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02M26/32, F02M26/29, F28F3/00, F28F9/02, F28F9/22, // F28D9/00, F28D21/00, F28F3/02 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
F02M26/32 (EP,KR);
F02M26/29 (KR);
F28D7/1684 (EP);
F28F1/025 (EP);
F28F1/426 (EP);
F28F27/02 (EP);
F28F3/00 (KR);
F28F2250/06 (EP);
F28F2265/26 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/07] | F02M26/32, F02M26/29, F28F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Title | German: | GASROHR FÜR AGR-KÜHLER | [2019/07] | English: | GAS TUBE FOR EGR COOLER | [2019/07] | French: | TUBE À GAZ POUR REFROIDISSEUR DE RECIRCULATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2019/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2018 | Translation filed | 12.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006219394 (MARTIN MICHAEL A [CA], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 11,12 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]EP2787211 (TOKYO RADIATOR SEIZO KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figures 1-9 ** paragraphs [0015] , [0034] , [0053] , [0056] *; | [XI]FR3008485 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1, 3, 4, 7-10 * * page 1 * * page 8 - page 10 * [I] 2-7; | [X]WO2015037688 (T RAD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 2, 7, 8 * * page 1 - page 9 *; | [X]KR20150108199 (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * * figures 4, 6, 8, 10 * * paragraph [0015] * | International search | [A]JP2001174169 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0022] and figure 5. *; | [A]JP2003314980 (TOYO RADIATOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7* See abstract, claims 1-2 and figure 1. *; | [Y]JP2011007138 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0046] and figure 5. *; | [Y]US2012138279 (PALANCHON HERVE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * See paragraphs [0029], [0035]-[0039] and figures 2, 12-16. *; | [A]JP2015078822 (T RAD CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * See abstract, paragraph [0015] and figures 1-2. * |