EP3324630 - FINGERPRINT IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Goodix Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAO, Weimin Floor 13, Phase B Tengfei Industrial Building Futian Free Trade Zone Shenzhen Guangdong 518045 / CN | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Straus, Alexander Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16898152.0 | 01.10.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016CN101421 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018058695 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3324630 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/91, G06K9/00, G06T9/00, G06F21/32, H04N19/593 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
H04N19/91 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/42 (CN,KR,US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (EP,US);
G06V40/12 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | H04N19/42, H04N19/91, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM FÜR FINGERABDRÜCKE | [2018/21] | English: | FINGERPRINT IMAGE PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2018/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE D'EMPREINTE DIGITALE | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2017 | Translation filed | 19.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 19.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2020 | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | 25.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 13.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016224775 (LIN WEI-TING [TW]) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0028] * [I] 3-6; | [A] - BAUGE M ET AL, "A 500-dpi ac capacitive hybrid flip-chip cmos asic/sensor module for fingerprint, navigation, and pointer detection with on-chip data processing", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20031201), vol. 38, no. 12, doi:10.1109/JSSC.2003.819175, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 2288 - 2296, XP011104272 [A] 3 * figures 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.2003.819175 | [A] - LI YUANMAN ET AL, "Anti-Forensics of Lossy Predictive Image Compression", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 22, no. 12, doi:10.1109/LSP.2015.2472561, ISSN 1070-9908, (20151201), pages 2219 - 2223, (20150902), XP011667904 [A] 4-6 * page 2220, paragraph II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LSP.2015.2472561 |