EP3299976 - GENE EXPRESSION DATA CLASSIFICATION METHOD AND CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soochow University No. 199 Renai Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Li No. 199 Ren'ai Road, Suzhou Industial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Xiaojuan No. 199 Ren'ai Road, Suzhou Industial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Bangjun No. 199 Ren'ai Road, Suzhou Industial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Zhao No. 199 Ren'ai Road, Suzhou Industial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 05 /
LI, Fanzhang No. 199 Ren'ai Road, Suzhou Industial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | zacco Dr. Peters & Partner Am Wall 187-189 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 16899247.7 | 17.11.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016CN106255 | Priority number, date | CN201610246971 | 20.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610246971 | [2018/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017181665 | Date: | 26.10.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299976 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.10.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/24, G06F19/18, G16H50/20 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G16B40/00 (EP,CN,US);
G16B40/20 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/2228 (EP,US);
G06F16/285 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N20/10 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | G06F19/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | KLASSIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND KLASSIFIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR GENEXPRESSIONSDATEN | [2018/13] | English: | GENE EXPRESSION DATA CLASSIFICATION METHOD AND CLASSIFICATION SYSTEM | [2018/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CLASSIFICATION DE DONNÉES D'EXPRESSION GÉNIQUE | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2017 | Translation filed | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 25.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004013727 (ROSETTA INPHARMATICS LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-10* pgs. 24-26, 40-41, 122-123 *; | [XI]WO2011127150 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9,10 * pgs. 3, 42-44, Example III, claim 1 * [I] 2,7,8 |