EP3352378 - RADIO FREQUENCY FRONT END, TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND CARRIER AGGREGATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Heping Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Jian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
PAN, Guangsheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Dingjie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
QIN, Hugen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16899840.9 | 29.04.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016CN80662 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017185328 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3352378 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3352378 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00, H04B1/52 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H04B1/00 (EP,US);
H04B1/0057 (US);
H04B1/006 (EP,US);
H04B1/52 (EP,US);
H04B1/56 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKFREQUENZ-FRONTEND, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND TRÄGERAGGREGATIONSVERFAHREN | [2018/30] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY FRONT END, TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND CARRIER AGGREGATION METHOD | [2018/30] | French: | FRONTAL RADIOFRÉQUENCE, APPAREIL TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ D'AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2018 | Translation filed | 18.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 18.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | AT | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | ES | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | IT | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | NL | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009093270 (BLOCK CHRISTIAN [AT], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0032] *; | [X]US2013273861 (SEE PUAY H [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0084] *; | [XI]US2014073268 (TANIUCHI HIROTADA [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0081] *[I] 8-10 | International search | [X]US2009093270 (BLOCK CHRISTIAN [AT], et al) [X] 1-11 * , description, paragraphs 0084-0094, and figures 3-5 *; | [A]CN102811032 (TAIYO YUDEN KK) [A] 1-11* , the whole document *; | [X]CN103684481 (SONY MOBILE COMM INC) [X] 1-11 * , description, paragraphs 0014 and 0069-0142, and figures 6-13 *; | [X]CN104247149 (QUALCOMM INC) [X] 1-11 * , description, paragraphs 0103-0121, and figures 7-9 * |