EP3383628 - MIXING POWDERED BUILD MATERIAL FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2018/41] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive W. Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANHAM, Bradley B Columbia Tech Center Suite 210 1115 SE 164th Avenue Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 02 /
ROMAN, Justin M Columbia Tech Center Suite 210 1115 SE 164th Avenue Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | 03 /
SCHALK, Wesley R Columbia Tech Center Suite 210 1115 SE 164th Avenue Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Franks, Adam Peter HP France SAS IP Section - Legal Department 5 avenue Raymond Chanas 38053 Grenoble / FR | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 16900751.5 | 30.04.2016 | [2018/41] | WO2016US30330 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017189019 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3383628 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/18, B01F9/02, B01F11/00, B01F15/02, B33Y70/00, B33Y40/00, B33Y50/02, B33Y30/00, B29C67/00 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
B33Y50/02 (EP,US);
B29C64/314 (EP,US);
B01F23/60 (EP);
B01F29/31 (EP);
B01F29/40112 (EP);
B01F29/4022 (EP);
B01F31/10 (EP);
B01F35/2209 (EP);
B01F35/331 (EP);
B01F35/332 (EP);
B01F35/53 (EP);
B29C64/205 (US);
B29C64/255 (US);
B29C64/321 (EP);
B29C64/329 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/34] | B01F9/02, B29C67/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/02, B33Y40/00, B33Y70/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/41] | B29C67/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/02, B33Y40/00, B33Y70/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | MISCHUNG VON PULVERBAUMATERIAL ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2018/41] | English: | MIXING POWDERED BUILD MATERIAL FOR ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2018/41] | French: | MÉLANGE D'UN MATÉRIAU DE CONSTRUCTION EN POUDRE POUR FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 06.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 24.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5238304 (ZIMMERMANN WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-11,13 * column 1, line 8 - line 27 * * column 1, line 50 - line 64 * * column 3, line 5 - line 27 * * column 3, line 51 - line 64 * * figure - * [A] 6 [I] 3,7,12,14; | [YA]US5884999 (MUZZIO FERNANDO J [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,7-10 * column 1, line 13 - line 16 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 64 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 11 * * column 5, line 3 - line 6 * * figure - *[A] 1,3,5,6,11-14; | [XAI]EP2388067 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 11,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * [A] 1-10,14 [I] 12; | [XAYI]US2014016431 (TAKENAKA YUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,11,13 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0125] * * figures 11,12 * [A] 5,6,14 [Y] 2,4,7,9,10 [I] 3,12; | [XAYI]US2015102059 (SANTRACH PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,11,13 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0128] * * figure - * [A] 5,6,14 [Y] 2,4,7-10 [I] 3,12 | International search | [A]JPS62227433 (TOKUJU KOSAKUSHO CO LTD) [A] 1-14* See claims 1-5; and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2001045678 (KUBO NAOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 9-10 * See abstract; paragraph [0057]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2008060330 (DAVIDSON THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See abstract. *; | [A]US7665636 (EDERER INGO [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * See abstract. *; | [XYA]US2013186514 (ZHUANG CHUAN-SHENG [TW], et al) [X] 1-6, 8, 11-14 * See abstract; paragraphs [0027],[0032]; claims 1, 6, 7; and figures 1, 3, 5. * [Y] 9-10 [A] 7 | by applicant | US5238304 | US2014016431 | US2015102059 |