EP3452723 - WOBBLE PLATE PISTON WATER PUMP FOR USE IN A LOW FLOW GAS PRESSURE WASHER OR A LOW CURRENT ELECTRIC PRESSURE WASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Active Products Inc. 56 Sheppard Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M2N1M2 / CA | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOU, James 56 Sheppard Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M2N1M2 / CA | 02 /
GU, Jiang-yong No. 25 Branch Jinzhang Road Industrial Zone Jinshan District Shanghai 201500 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Ming 56 Sheppard Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M2N1M2 / CA | 04 /
LAM, Man Chung Kenneth 56 Sheppard Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M2N1M2 / CA | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 16900782.0 | 05.10.2016 | [2019/11] | WO2016CA51158 | Priority number, date | US201662332808P | 06.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662332808 P | CN201610443275 | 20.06.2016 Original published format: CN201610443275 | CN201620606037U | 20.06.2016 Original published format: CN 201620606037 U | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017190212 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3452723 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3452723 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 09.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/14, F04B1/12, F04B17/03, F04B17/05, F04B43/00, F04B43/02, F04B1/28, F04B1/146 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
F04B43/02 (EP,US);
F04B1/12 (EP,US);
F04B1/14 (EP,US);
F04B1/146 (EP);
F04B1/148 (US);
F04B1/28 (EP,US);
F04B17/03 (EP);
F04B17/05 (EP,US);
F04B43/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/44] | F04B43/02, F04B1/12, F04B43/00, F04B1/14, F04B1/28 | ||
Former IPC [2019/11] | F04B43/02, F04B1/12, F04B43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAUMELSCHEIBENKOLBENWASSERPUMPE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER NIEDERSTROM-GASDRUCKSCHEIBE ODER EINER NIEDERSTROM-ELEKTRODRUCKSCHEIBE | [2019/11] | English: | WOBBLE PLATE PISTON WATER PUMP FOR USE IN A LOW FLOW GAS PRESSURE WASHER OR A LOW CURRENT ELECTRIC PRESSURE WASHER | [2019/11] | French: | POMPE À EAU À PISTON À PLATEAU OSCILLANT DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UN NETTOYEUR À PRESSION DE GAZ À FAIBLE DÉBIT OU UN NETTOYEUR À PRESSION ÉLECTRIQUE À FAIBLE COURANT | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 16.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24153676.2 / EP4336041 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5529460 (EIHUSEN JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 4 * claims 1,3,6,7,9,13 *; | [Y]CN201558824U (NINGBO LAND IND CO LTD) [Y] 9* figure 3 *; | [Y]CN204371575U (ALLEN SOUND) [Y] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US9051927 (GILPATRICK RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 57; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-6,9 [I] 7,8 | International search | [Y]US5529460 (EIHUSEN JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 4, 12*Entire Document*; | [Y]CN203098170U (NINGBO HERRY MACHINERY CO LTD) [Y] 1, 4-10, 12 *Entire Document*; | [Y]CN204371575U (ALLEN SOUND) [Y] 1, 4-10, 12 *Entire Document*; | [Y]US9316216 (COOK JAMES E [US], et al) [Y] 9 *Entire Document* | by applicant | US5529460 | CN201558824U | CN204371575U | US9051927 |