19.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.04.2020 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
06.03.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
07.02.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.10.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
10.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
05.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|