EP3562630 - ROBOT LAWN MOWER BUMPER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIN, Russell Walter 138 Mill Street Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 02 /
PIERCE, Travis 8 Cottage Walk Bedford, New Hampshire 03110 / US | 03 /
BRADLEY, Chris 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 01730 / US | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/45] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16901162.4 | 30.12.2016 | [2019/45] | WO2016US69530 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018125222 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562630 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25J13/08, B25J19/02, G05D1/00, G05D3/12, G01R33/00, H01L43/00 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G01R33/072 (EP);
A01D34/00 (EP);
G01R33/00 (EP);
G05D1/0227 (EP);
H10N52/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | ROBOTERRASENMÄHERSTOSSFÄNGERSYSTEM | [2019/45] | English: | ROBOT LAWN MOWER BUMPER SYSTEM | [2019/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PARE-CHOCS DE TONDEUSE À GAZON ROBOTIQUE | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 26.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0896207 (BERNINA ELECTRONIC AG [CH]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017]; figures 5, 6 *; | [Y]US2003047016 (KLIEMANNEL WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 32]; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2005234612 (BOTTOMLEY IAN [GB], et al) [Y] 8,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 29] , [0 48] *; | [Y]JP2013059145 (DENSO WAVE INC) [Y] 13,14* paragraph [0025]; figure 3 *; | [IY]US2016081526 (GOTTINGER CLEMENS [AT], et al) [I] 1,3-6,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 37] , [0 50]; figures 1,2,5,19 * [Y] 2,7,8,10,13-15; | [Y]WO2016150510 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) [Y] 7 * figure 6 with description * | International search | [Y]US6810305 (KIRKPATRICK JR JAMES FREDERICK [US]) [Y] 1, 5-10, 18-20, 24-26 * ; figures 2-3; column 2, lines 39-40; column 3, lines 39-50, 63-65; column 5, lines 40-51; column 6, lines 1-27, 36-45; column 7, lines 11-24, 51-61 *; | [A]US2010134101 (RIVA CATERINA [IT], et al) [A] 12* ; figure 2; paragraph [0027] *; | [Y]US2011121500 (STANFORTH KYLE W [US], et al) [Y] 6 * ; figure 4; paragraph [0020] *; | [Y]CN202243772U (UNIV GUANGZHOU) [Y] 5, 7 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0006], [0018] *; | [Y]US2014067124 (WILLIAMSON MATTHEW MURRAY [US], et al) [Y] 21-22, 27 * ; figure 2; paragraphs [0023], [0026], [0028]-[0031], [0055] *; | [Y]US2014097835 (SARTEE JARED A [US], et al) [Y] 1, 3, 5-11, 15-20, 24-26 * ; figures 1 a-b, 6; paragraphs [0056], [0064], [0069], [0095]-[0096] *; | [Y]US2015160298 (TABATOWSKI-BUSH BENJAMIN A [US]) [Y] 11, 23 * figure 1; paragraphs [0021], [0026]-[0029] *; | [Y]JP5799685B (DENSO WAVE INC.) [Y] 15-17 * ; figure 1; paragraph [0025] *; | [XY]US2016354935 (FAY VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 18-19, 24-26 * ; figures 2, 7, 8a, 25; paragraphs [0002], [0010]-[0011], [0049], [0054], [0064]-[0065], [0069], [0071]-[0072], [0082], [0118] * [Y] 1-3, 11, 15-17, 21-23, 27; | [Y] - GOMEZ, SC et al., "A Three-Toe Biped Foot with Hall-Effect Sensing", IEEE/RSJ International Conference on Intelligent Robots and Systems (IROS), (20150928), pages 360 - 365, XP032831619 [Y] 3 * Figures 2-3; page 3, column 2, last paragraph; page 4, column 1, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2015.7353398 |