EP3430555 - BIOMETRIC UNIQUE COMBINATION IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sahoo, Sambit c/o: Shubhalaxmi Agencies (P) Ltd Gopinathpur Sahi PO: Raj Sunakhala Dist: Nayagarh, Odisha 752065 / IN | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/04] | For all designated states Sahoo, Sambit c/o: Shubhalaxmi Agencies (P) Ltd Gopinathpur Sahi PO: Raj Sunakhala Dist: Nayagarh, Odisha 752065 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/04] | Representative(s) | Lachmannová, Eva, et al Sindelka & Lachmannová, advokati Slavetinska 1146/39 190 14 Praha - Klánovice / CZ | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/04] | Gallego Jiménez, José Fernando Ingenias Creaciones, Signos e Invenciones S.L.P. Avda. Diagonal 421, 2 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 16901580.7 | 09.11.2016 | [2019/04] | WO2016IN50392 | Priority number, date | IN201631016385 | 11.05.2016 Original published format: IN201631016385 | [2019/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017195211 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3430555 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3430555 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06V40/70, G06F21/32, G06Q20/40, G06K9/00, G06Q50/26, H04L9/32, G06Q20/10 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G06Q50/26 (EP,US);
G06V40/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/35] | G06F21/32, G06Q20/40, G06K9/00, G06Q50/26, H04L29/06, H04L9/32, G06Q20/10 | ||
Former IPC [2019/04] | G06F21/32, G06Q20/40, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT BIOMETRISCHER EINDEUTIGER KOMBINATION | [2019/04] | English: | BIOMETRIC UNIQUE COMBINATION IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM | [2019/04] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMBINAISON BIOMÉTRIQUE UNIQUE | [2019/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 13.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2023 | CZ | 15.02.2023 | DK | 15.02.2023 | EE | 15.02.2023 | ES | 15.02.2023 | FI | 15.02.2023 | HR | 15.02.2023 | IT | 15.02.2023 | LT | 15.02.2023 | LV | 15.02.2023 | MC | 15.02.2023 | NL | 15.02.2023 | PL | 15.02.2023 | RO | 15.02.2023 | RS | 15.02.2023 | SE | 15.02.2023 | SI | 15.02.2023 | SK | 15.02.2023 | SM | 15.02.2023 | NO | 15.05.2023 | GR | 16.05.2023 | IS | 15.06.2023 | PT | 15.06.2023 | LU | 09.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
MC | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
IT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SI | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SK | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
CZ | 15.02.2023 | ||
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RO | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
EE | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
DK | 15.02.2023 | ||
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
SM | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
IS | 15.06.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
PL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
GR | 16.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
FI | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
LV | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
SE | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 15.02.2023 | |
ES | 15.02.2023 | ||
HR | 15.02.2023 | ||
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
NL | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
NO | 15.05.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | ||
RS | 15.02.2023 | ||
PT | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 15.02.2023 | |
LT | 15.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011204142 (RAO CSS [IN]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0093] *; | [A]WO2015124770 (HANSCAN IP BV [NL]) [A] 1,2 * figure 3 * * figure 4 ** page 2, line 1 - line 23 *; | [A]US2015317637 (KURIBARA CARLOS ISSAO [BR], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0029] *; | [I]US2016099937 (WHITE CONOR ROBERT [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * figure 1 * * figures 7, 7A * * figures 8, 8A * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0073] * | International search | [A]US2011320037 (FRUGONE JOSE [US]) [A] 1-11* whole document *; | [X]US2015317637 (KURIBARA CARLOS ISSAO [BR], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract, figures 1-5, and paragraphs [0014]-[0018] and [0019]- [0029] * | by applicant | WO9008366 | US5291560 | US5719950 | DE10150979 | TW571263B | WO2006095067 | CN101398961 | WO2011163071 |