EP3457562 - PHOTOVOLTAIC GENERATION DEVICE, SOLAR BATTERY PADDLE, AND SPACE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMODA, Naoko c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TAKEYA, Hajime c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
OHKUBO, Mitsuru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
KAWAKATSU, Shinobu c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
SEKI, Kazuyoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2019/12] | Application number, filing date | 16901637.5 | 11.05.2016 | [2019/12] | WO2016JP63975 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017195289 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457562 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02S30/20, B64G1/44 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
H02S30/20 (EP,US);
B64G1/443 (EP,US);
B64G1/222 (US);
B64G1/2224 (EP);
B64G1/44 (US);
H01L27/142 (US);
H01L31/042 (EP);
H01L31/044 (EP);
H01L31/0443 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | FOTOVOLTAISCHE ERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SOLARBATTERIEPADDEL UND RAUMSTRUKTUR | [2019/12] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC GENERATION DEVICE, SOLAR BATTERY PADDLE, AND SPACE STRUCTURE | [2019/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE, PANNEAU DE BATTERIE SOLAIRE ORIENTABLE, ET STRUCTURE SPATIALE | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2018 | Translation filed | 05.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 17.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0219734 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | [Y]JPS62196875 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPH10147298 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]EP1598874 (DUTCH SPACE B V [NL]); | [A]DE102007037470 (RUNGE HANS WILLY [DE]); | [A]EP2886467 (THALES SA [FR]) | International search | [A]JPH10147298 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2001332752 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2003267299 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2015189469 (AIRBUS DS GMBH) |