19.11.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
04.08.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
07.07.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
11.05.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
01.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
19.06.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2020 |
First examination report |
|
19.02.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.07.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
26.07.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.03.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
01.02.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
01.02.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.02.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
29.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
30.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|