Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019149918 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN108080 | 30.11.2016 | CN201610333675 | 19.05.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3451695 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | A4 | EP3451695 | 06.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN108080 | 30.11.2016 | CN201610333675 | 19.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017197867 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201610333675 | 19.05.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107404684 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201610333675 | 19.05.2016 |