EP3461194 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING REFERENCE SIGNAL, NETWORK DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 16902709.1 | 26.05.2016 | [2019/13] | WO2016CN83552 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017201719 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3461194 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.11.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W48/08 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W72/044 (KR);
H04L5/0048 (CN,KR);
H04W72/53 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/005 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0073 (CN);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/046 (US);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W80/02 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/13] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES REFERENZSIGNALS, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/13] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING REFERENCE SIGNAL, NETWORK DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2019/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU, ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | Translation filed | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 31.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013112960 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0078]; figures 5-8 *[I] 2-7,9-14; | [XI]EP2906016 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,6-10,13-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0238] * [I] 4,5,11,12; | [X] - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "Framework for forward compatible NR design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-164664, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051096363 [X] 1,8,15 * Section 3.; page 2 * | [X] - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS, "Reference signal principles for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20160411 - 20160415, (20160402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-162578, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84b/Docs/, (20160402), XP051080267 [X] 1,3,8,10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2014133429 (CHUN JIN YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-44* , the whole document *; | [X]CN104081852 (QUALCOMM INC) [X] 1-44 * , claims 1, 2, 8, 9, 10, 11, 17 and 18, and description, paragraphs [0003]-[0015], [0058], [0065] and [0067] *; | [A]CN104488201 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-44 * , the whole document * |