EP3464926 - SELF-AMPLIFYING SAFETY BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CH, FR | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drillform Technical Services Ltd. 7920 - 56 Street SE Calgary, AB T2C 4S9 / CA | [2022/42] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Drillform Technical Services Ltd. 7920 - 56 Street SE Calgary, AB T2C 4S9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCEKIC, Vladimir 411 7th Avenue New Westminster, British Columbia V3L 1W6 / CA | 02 /
GNASIENCO, Radu 654 Girard Avenue Coquitlam, British Columbia V3K 1S8 / CA | 03 /
TURNBULL, Russell 57-7128 Stride Avenue Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 1T5 / CA | 04 /
BATALHA, Kevin 908-1331 West Georgia Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6E 4P1 / CA | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2022/42] |
Former [2019/15] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 16903376.8 | 03.06.2016 | [2019/15] | WO2016CA50638 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017205956 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464926 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464926 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D59/02, F16D55/22, F16D65/14 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
F16D55/224 (EP,US);
F16D59/02 (EP,US);
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D2125/28 (EP,US);
F16D2127/08 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTVERSTÄRKENDE SICHERHEITSBREMSE | [2019/15] | English: | SELF-AMPLIFYING SAFETY BRAKE | [2019/15] | French: | FREIN DE SÉCURITÉ AUTO-AMPLIFICATEUR | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 30.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | IE | 03.06.2023 | LU | 03.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 30.06.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
IE | 03.06.2023 | ||
LU | 03.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
LU | 03.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3995722 (JONES ROGER D, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 21 ** figure 1 *; | [A]US4457408 (MONTALVO III WILLIAM W [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 28 - line 42 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 37 * * figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]US3995722 (JONES ROGER D, et al)[A] 1-13; | [A]FR2463326 (MECANERAL [FR]) [A] 1-13; | [A]US4457408 (MONTALVO III WILLIAM W [US]) [A] 1-13; | [A]US6666305 (VOHLA MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-13; | [A]US2008230330 (HERR MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-13 | by applicant | US4457408 |