EP3476179 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING CLUSTER-HEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/37] |
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jinhua No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhan No. 5 Lize East Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
FODOR, Gabor Astrakangatan 124 165 52 Hässelby / SE | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2019/18] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16906588.5 | 28.06.2016 | [2019/18] | WO2016CN87423 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018000185 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476179 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3476179 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W84/20, H04W84/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04W84/20 (EP,US);
H04L45/021 (US);
H04L45/123 (US);
H04L45/125 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | H04W84/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON CLUSTER-KÖPFEN | [2019/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING CLUSTER-HEADS | [2019/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE TÊTES DE GRAPPE | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 06.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2016 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.06.2016 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.06.2016 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016143077 (FODOR GABOR [SE], et al) [Y] 2,4 * paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]WO2015043687 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [Y] 8-12 * page 32 - page 49 *; | [Y]US2014229519 (DIETRICH DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0089] * | [XY] - YADAV SEEMA ET AL, "A load balanced clustering architecture with two cluster heads", 2013 TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS (WOCN), IEEE, doi:10.1109/WOCN.2013.6616205, ISSN 2151-7681, (20130726), pages 1 - 5, (20130930), XP032492705 [X] 1,6,7,13,14,16 * page 2 - page 3; figure 2 * [Y] 2-5,8-12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WOCN.2013.6616205 | [Y] - SHUO XIAO ET AL, "Study on the Hierarchical Structure of Wireless Sensor Networks", COMPUTATIONAL AND INFORMATION SCIENCES (ICCIS), 2012 FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120817), doi:10.1109/ICCIS.2012.303, ISBN 978-1-4673-2406-9, pages 1013 - 1016, XP032236732 [Y] 3,5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCIS.2012.303 | International search | [Y]US2014304383 (GUO JIANLIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * description, paragraphs [0066]-[0084], claims 1-19 and figures 3, 4 *; | [Y]CN103596203 (UNIV CHANGCHUN TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-28 * description, paragraphs [0011]-[0026] and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN103068073 (WANG FUJUAN) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101594287 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015043687 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | by applicant | - "A load balanced clustering architecture with two cluster heads", YADAV SEEMA et al., 2013 TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS (WOCN, IEEE, (20130726), pages 1 - 5 |