EP3418331 - APPLICATION OF SELF-REPAIRING MATERIAL FOR USE IN 3D PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanjing University No. 163 Xianlin Avenue Qixia Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chenghui No. 163 Xianlin Avenue Qixia District Nanjing Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 02 /
LAI, Jiancheng No. 163 Xianlin Avenue Qixia District Nanjing Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 03 /
YOU, Xiaozeng No. 163 Xianlin Avenue Qixia District Nanjing Jiangsu 210023 / CN | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Eggenfeldenerstraße 56 81929 München / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 16906643.8 | 29.06.2016 | [2018/52] | WO2016CN87670 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018000242 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3418331 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/08, C08L83/04, C08L83/06, B29C64/00, B29C73/16 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B29C73/18 (EP,US);
B29C64/00 (US);
B29C73/16 (US);
C08G77/26 (US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/06 (EP,US);
C08L83/08 (EP,US);
B29K2083/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0037 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/52] | C08L83/08, C08L83/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNG VON SELBSTREPARIERENDEM MATERIAL IM 3D-DRUCK | [2018/52] | English: | APPLICATION OF SELF-REPAIRING MATERIAL FOR USE IN 3D PRINTING | [2018/52] | French: | APPLICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU AUTORÉPARATEUR POUR UNE UTILISATION EN IMPRESSION 3D | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2018 | Translation filed | 19.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 20.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN105111470 ; | [XY]CN105294936 ; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 27, Database accession no. 2015-800515, XP002793883 & CN105111470 A 20151202 (UNIV SICHUAN) [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0028] * [Y] 4,5 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 35, Database accession no. 2016-098892, XP002793884 & CN105294936 A 20160203 (HANGZHOU LONGQIN NEW MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * [Y] 4,5 | [Y] - YING YANG ET AL, "Chemical and physical aspects of self-healing materials", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE., GB, (20151001), vol. 49-50, doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2015.06.001, ISSN 0079-6700, pages 34 - 59, XP055616474 [Y] 4,5 * Part 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2015.06.001 | International search | [A]CN104961881 (UNIV SICHUAN) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN105088043 (HEBEI ANZ NEW ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [X]CN105111470 (UNIV SICHUAN) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0006]-[0020], [0026]-[0028] and [0031] * |