EP3477471 - CONTROL DEVICE, VNF DEPLOYMENT DESTINATION SELECTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | 30.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | 30.08.2019 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOHIRA, Mayo c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
TAKEMORI, Shigeto c/o NEC COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS LTD. 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0073 / JP | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 16907224.6 | 27.06.2016 | [2019/18] | WO2016JP69014 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018002991 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3477471 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F9/46, H04L12/70 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (US);
G06F9/50 (US);
G06F9/5044 (US);
G06F9/5077 (EP,US);
G06F2009/4557 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL DES VNF-EINSETZZIELS UND PROGRAMM | [2019/18] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE, VNF DEPLOYMENT DESTINATION SELECTION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2019/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE DESTINATION DE DÉPLOIEMENT VNF ET PROGRAMME | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2018 | Translation filed | 30.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 23.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015143983 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-8,14,15 * abstract * [I] 9-13; | US2017039089 [ ] (XIA JINWEI [CN], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] ** figure 3 * | International search | [A]JP2007328461 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15* , entire text & US 2007/0283128 A1 & EP 1865417 A2 & KR 10-2007-0116740 A & CN 101086722 A *; | [YA]JP2011018198 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 3-11, 13 * , paragraphs [0082] to [0095] & US 2011/0010634 A1 paragraphs [0114] to [0129] * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2013041361 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 5-11, 13 * , paragraphs [0037], [0048] (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2013196206 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 1-11, 13-15 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0018], [0024] to [0037] & US 2013/0246679 A1 paragraphs [0030] to [0031], [0038] to [0051] * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2016509412 (Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-11, 13-15 * , paragraph [0003] & WO 2014/110453 A1 & US 2014/0201374 A1 paragraph [0005] & CN 105247826 A * [A] 12 | by applicant | - "Network Functions Virtualisation (NFV); Management and Orchestration", ETSI GS NFV-MAN 001, (20160609), URL: http://www.etsi.org/deliver/etsi_gs/NFV-MAN/001 _099/001/01.01.01_60/gs_NFV-MAN001v010101p.pdf | - "Network Functions Virtualisation (NFV); Infrastructure; Compute Domain", ETSI GS NFV-INF 003, (20160609), URL: http://www.etsi.org/deliver/etsi_gs/NFV-INF/001_099/003/01.01.01_60/gs_nfv-inf003v010101p.pdf |