EP3396879 - MULTI-CHANNEL SERVICE TRANSPORTING AND RECEIVING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
VISSERS, Maarten P. J. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16909269.9 | 22.07.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016CN91055 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018014342 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396879 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3396879 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
H04J3/1664 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0062 (US);
H04J2203/0012 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0057 (US);
H04J2203/0071 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKANALDIENSTTRANSPORT- UND EMPFANGSVERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/44] | English: | MULTI-CHANNEL SERVICE TRANSPORTING AND RECEIVING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SERVICES À CANAUX MULTIPLES | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2018 | Translation filed | 25.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 25.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2016 | AL | 16.12.2020 | AT | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | DK | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | ES | 16.12.2020 | FI | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | IT | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | LV | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | MT | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | RS | 16.12.2020 | SE | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | SM | 16.12.2020 | TR | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | NO | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | GB | 22.07.2021 | IE | 22.07.2021 | LU | 22.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | FR | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
TR | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
IE | 22.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
IE | 22.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
IE | 22.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
IE | 22.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
IE | 22.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
LU | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
GB | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
DK | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
AT | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
FI | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
LV | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SE | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 16.12.2020 | |
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
NO | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003048813 (LAHAV DANNY [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0044]; figures 2,3,4,5 * * paragraph [0046] *; | [I] - TAKASHI KUWABARA FUJITSU JAPAN, "B100G ODUflex with modular frame structure (ODUflexM);C 0474", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2013-2016, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20140311), vol. 11/15, pages 1 - 8, XP044075155 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]CN101155006 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-56 * , description, page 7, paragraphs 1-9 *; | [A]CN102377525 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM) [A] 1-56 * , the whole document *; | [A]WO2015035883 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-56* , the whole document * |