13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
07.04.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
09.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
29.04.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
25.04.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.04.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.04.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.12.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.11.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
15.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
15.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
27.09.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
27.09.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
24.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.12.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] |
30.12.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.12.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] |
21.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
27.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|