EP3487239 - SEMI-STATIC TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Xiao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CAO, Zhenzhen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/46] |
Former [2019/21] | 01 /
XIAO, Xiao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
CAO, Zhenzhen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 16912381.7 | 12.08.2016 | [2019/21] | WO2016CN94943 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018027926 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3487239 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3487239 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W28/0215 (US);
H04W28/18 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04W8/24 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HALBSTATISCHEN ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2019/21] | English: | SEMI-STATIC TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2019/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION SEMI-STATIQUE | [2023/25] |
Former [2019/21] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION SEMI-STATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2019 | Translation filed | 13.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 17.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN102104959 (POTEVIO INST TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0114] *; | [X]EP2343946 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0198] *; | [I]US2014023008 (AHN JAE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0032] ** paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0112] *; | [X]WO2015113398 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2942993 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0173] *; | EP3101969 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0141] * | International search | [A]CN101765211 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-96 * , entire document *; | [A]CN102056174 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-96 * , entire document *; | [X]CN102104959 (POTEVIO INST TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-96 * , description, paragraphs 60-114 *; | [A]US2013039320 (ARIMA TAKENOBU [JP]) [A] 1-96 * , entire document *; | [X] - ZTE, "SPS Enhancements for V2X over Uu", 3GPP TSGRAN WG2 #94, R2-163840, (20160527), XP051105239 [X] 1-96 * , section 2 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "SPS Enhancements for Uu Operations in V2X", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #94, R2-164112, (20160527), XP051105429 [A] 1-96 * , entire document * | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "SPS for V2V Communication", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 Meeting #94, R2-164063, (20160527), XP051105386 [A] 1-96 * , entire document * | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "eNodeB Signalling for SPS Resource Allocation", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #85, Rl-164421, (20160527), XP051096458 [A] 1-96 * , entire document * | [A] - OPPO, "Discussion on SPS Enhancements for V2X", 3GPP TSG-RAN2 Meeting #94, R2-163406, (20160427), XP051104928 [A] 1-96 * , entire document * | Examination | CN102104959B | EP2942993 |