EP3373679 - METHOD, DEVICE, AND EQUIPMENT FOR SELECTING RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Yu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZENG, Yongbo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Gill Jennings & Every LLP SAH The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 16912446.8 | 12.08.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016CN95054 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018027991 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3373679 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W72/02 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04W28/26 (RU,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04W72/52 (RU,US);
H04W72/542 (RU,US);
H04W74/0808 (EP,RU,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/37] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND AUSRÜSTUNG ZUR AUSWAHL VON RESSOURCEN | [2018/37] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE, AND EQUIPMENT FOR SELECTING RESOURCE | [2018/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE SÉLECTION DE RESSOURCE | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2018 | Translation filed | 04.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 04.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2015334760 (SARTORI PHILIPPE [US], et al); | International search | [A]CN101478792 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN]); | [X]CN102083208 (POTEVIO INST TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]US2013072213 (AGRAWAL RAJEEV [US], et al); | [A]CN103327613 (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL, et al); | [A]CN105634990 (ZTE CORP) |