EP3499488 - GOA CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuhan China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. Building C5 Biolake of Optics Valley No. 666 Gaoxin Avenue East Lake High-tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430070 / CN | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yafeng 666 Gaoxin Avenue Wuhan East Lake High-tech Development Zone Building C5 Biolake of Optics Valley Wuhan Hubei 430070 / CN | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 16912464.1 | 31.08.2016 | [2019/25] | WO2016CN97457 | Priority number, date | CN201610642892 | 08.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610642892 | [2019/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018028009 | Date: | 15.02.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499488 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3499488 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.02.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, G09G3/36, G11C19/28 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
G09G3/3677 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09G3/3696 (KR,US);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/3648 (KR,US);
G09G3/3688 (KR,US);
G11C19/28 (EP,US);
G09G2230/00 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0408 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0283 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | G09G3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GOA-SCHALTUNG | [2019/25] | English: | GOA CIRCUIT | [2019/25] | French: | CIRCUIT GOA | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | Translation filed | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 24.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2016018844 (SASAKI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0136] , [0156] - [0164]; figures 25-31 *[A] 2,3,6-10; | [XA]CN205122157U (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5 * pages 1-6; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 2,3,6-10 | International search | [A]US2012207266 (TOBITA YOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* , entire document *; | [A]CN103081360 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-17 * , description, paragraph [0053], and figure 4 *; | [A]CN105609135 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , entire document *; | [A]CN205334926U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , entire document * | Examination | CN105513550 |