EP3508963 - INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2021/24] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lianming Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
AI, Ke Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Wenfeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/28] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/28] | Application number, filing date | 16916441.5 | 21.09.2016 | [2019/28] | WO2016CN99556 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018053700 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3508963 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/04182 (EP,US);
G06F3/0418 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | G06F3/044 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] | Title | German: | INTERFERENZUNTERDRÜCKUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR BERÜHRUNGSTAFEL | [2019/28] | English: | INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TOUCH PANEL | [2019/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SUPPRESSION D'INTERFÉRENCE POUR ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2019/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2019 | Translation filed | 02.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 25.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 02.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.12.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008279324 (LIN TZU-CHEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2015199046 (OLSON DANA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0093]; figure 10 * | International search | [A]CN102841715 (SHENZHEN GOODIX TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , the description *; | [A]CN103677449 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-13 * , description, paragraphs [0054]-[0118], and figures 1-6 *; | [A]US8810546 (KREMIN VICTOR [UA], et al) [A] 1-13 * , the description *; | [A]CN105144048 (GOOGLE TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS LLC) [A] 1-13 * , the description *; | [A]US2015370410 (SAUER CHRISTIAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-13* , the description *; | [A]CN105528117 (QINGDAO HISENSE MOBILE COMM) [A] 1-13 * , the description * |