EP3499813 - PROTECTION SWITCHING METHOD AND NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Haomian Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Yu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
BUSI, Italo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
TAN, Qinfen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
LU, Qingcong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/30] |
Former [2019/25] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16916455.5 | 21.09.2016 | [2019/25] | WO2016CN99602 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018053716 | Date: | 29.03.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499813 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3499813 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.03.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/10, H04J3/14 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H04B10/038 (US);
H04B10/0771 (US);
H04J3/14 (EP,US);
H04J2203/006 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | H04L12/707, H04L12/703, H04Q11/00, H04J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND KNOTEN | [2019/25] | English: | PROTECTION SWITCHING METHOD AND NODE | [2019/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION DE PROTECTION ET NOEUD | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2019 | Translation filed | 14.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 26.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2016 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | IT | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | IE | 21.09.2021 | LU | 21.09.2021 | FR | 28.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.09.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
IT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
IE | 21.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.09.2021 | ||
FR | 28.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN103098416 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0109] *; | [A]EP2919405 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0013] - [0 17] , [0021] - [0027] - [0051] , [0 63] - [0066] *; | [Y]WO2015165033 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0039] , [ 148] - [0152] *; | [Y]EP2953299 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0012] , [0013] , [0017] , [0019] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0041] - [0043] - [0047] , [0 49] , [0 52] , [0068] , [0 69] , [0090] , [0100] , [0112] *; | [A] - FATAI ZHANG HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CHINA OSCAR GONZALEZ DE DIOS TELEFONICA INVESTIGACION Y DESARROLLO SPAIN YANLONG WANG CHINA UNICOM, "Discussion on APS of Shared Mesh Protection;C 1082", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2009-2012, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20100521), vol. 9/15, pages 1 - 11, XP017447774 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]CN102136865 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-26 * , description, paragraphs [0177]-[0217], and figure 6 *; | [A]CN103098416 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * , entire document *; | [A]CN103534961 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * , entire document *; | [A]US9369409 (HU JUNQIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-26* , entire document * | Examination | CN102136865 |