EP3457648 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, RECEPTION SIDE DEVICE, AND SENDING SIDE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | ||
Former [2019/12] | For all designated states Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
XU, Hua 5 Appaloosa Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2M1N6 / CA | [2019/12] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16917124.6 | 28.09.2016 | [2019/12] | WO2016CN100566 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018058369 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3457648 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/00, H04L1/08, H04L1/06, H04L1/18, H04B7/024 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
H04L1/0606 (EP,US);
H04L1/0011 (KR,US);
H04B7/024 (US);
H04L1/04 (KR);
H04L1/0668 (EP,US);
H04L1/0675 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | H04L27/00, H04L1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, EMPFANGSSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG UND SENDESEITIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/12] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, RECEPTION SIDE DEVICE, AND SENDING SIDE DEVICE | [2019/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉCEPTION ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ ÉMISSION | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2018 | Translation filed | 12.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/51] | 18.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009090854 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-9,15 * page 4, paragraph 19 - page 5 * * page 7, paragraph 30 - page 15, paragraph 63; figures 3-5 * * page 22, paragraph 77 - paragraph 81 * [I] 2-5,10-14; | [XI]US2004057530 (TAROKH VAHID [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9,15 * page 6, column r, paragraph 65 - page 9, column l, paragraph 87; figures 6-11 * [I] 2-5,10-14; | [I]US2009241002 (KO SOO-MIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 57 - paragraph 60 * |