EP3520019 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD TO INCREASE THE TEMPERATURE OF A LIQUID IN THE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETHERCUTT, Jeremy, C. c/o Cummins Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | 02 /
ARSLANTURK, Emrah c/o Cummins Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | 03 /
WANG, Weiwen c/o Cummins Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | 04 /
CRAMER, James A. c/o Cummins Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, IN 47201 / US | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Ridderbusch, Oliver Prisma IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Landshuter Allee 10 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16917969.4 | 30.09.2016 | [2019/32] | WO2016US54604 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018063267 | Date: | 05.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520019 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/70, F02D41/06, F02D41/08, // F02D9/06 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
F02D41/068 (EP);
F02D41/0255 (US);
F01N3/2013 (US);
F01P3/20 (US);
F02B37/22 (EP,US);
F02D13/0242 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP);
F02D41/144 (US);
F02D41/1441 (US);
F02D41/1448 (US);
F02D9/04 (EP);
G05D23/1917 (US);
F01N2240/36 (EP);
F01N2560/06 (EP);
F01P2070/04 (US);
F02D2041/026 (US);
F02D2200/021 (EP);
F02D2200/023 (US);
F02D2200/0406 (US);
F02D2250/24 (EP,US);
F02D2250/34 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | G06G7/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER TEMPERATUR EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT IM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2019/32] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD TO INCREASE THE TEMPERATURE OF A LIQUID IN THE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2019/32] | French: | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE D'UN LIQUIDE DANS LE MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2019/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 02.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05163978 (AISAN IND) [X] 1,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] *; | [X]EP1178197 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0076] - [0081]; figure 15 * * paragraphs [0085] - [0094]; figures 18,19 *; | [X]EP1250523 (INT TRUCK & ENGINE CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0066] - [0075]; figure 10 *; | [XI]EP1298301 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0024]; figure 1 * [I] 5-8,10; | [XI]US2013184970 (KANAFANI FADI S [CA]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,11,12 * figures 11,12 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0053] *[I] 5,10; | [X]US2015000630 (COLDREN DANA RAY [US]) [X] 1-4,11,12 * paragraphs [0044] - [0050]; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]US5645745 (HARTWICK LARRY R [US], et al) [Y] 4, 5, 11/(4, 5), 12/(11/4, 11/5), 16 * entire document *; | [Y]US2001011455 (HARIMA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 10, 11/(10), 12/(11/10), 21* entire document *; | [XY]US2001018632 (THOMAS ERIC D [US]) [X] 1, 3, 7, 11/(1, 3, 7), 12/(11/1, 11/3, 11/7), 13, 15, 18 * entire document * [Y] 4-6, 10, 11/(4, 5, 6, 10), 12/(11/4-11/6, 11/10), 16, 17, 21; | [Y]US2014144997 (EISENHOUR RONALD S [US], et al) [Y] 4, 6, 11/(4,6), 12/(11/4, 11/6), 17 * entire document *; | [X]US2014196454 (ULREY JOSEPH NORMAN [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 8, 9, 11/(1, 2, 8, 9), 12/(11/1, 11/2, 11/8, 11/9), 13, 14, 19, 20 * entire document * |