Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018064836 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN101596 | 09.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10826189 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | B2 | US2019131713 | 02.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN101596 | 09.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6710437B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | B2 | JP2019525656 | 05.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN101596 | 09.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108701904B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2021 | B | CN108701904 | 23.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN101596 | 09.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3416242 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2020 | B1 | EP3416242 | 17.04.2019 | A4 | EP3416242 | 19.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN101596 | 09.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019004165 | 11.10.2022 | B1 | BR112019004165 | 28.05.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN101596 | 09.10.2016 |