EP3523989 - IOT DEVICE CONNECTIVITY PROVISIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Peter Blumenstraße 21 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [2019/33] | Application number, filing date | 16918205.2 | 07.10.2016 | [2019/33] | WO2016FI50697 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018065660 | Date: | 12.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3523989 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3523989 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 12.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W12/08, H04W48/18 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/50 (EP,US);
H04W4/60 (EP,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W12/03 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEREITSTELLUNG DER KONNEKTIVITÄT VON IOT-VORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/33] | English: | IOT DEVICE CONNECTIVITY PROVISIONING | [2019/33] | French: | FOURNITURE DE CONNECTIVITÉ DE DISPOSITIF DE L'INTERNET DES OBJETS | [2019/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 07.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009092115 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0140]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2010106967 (JOHANSSON MATTIAS [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] *; | [X]US2014329502 (LEE JINHYOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0100] * | International search | [X]US2011136482 (KALINER STEFAN [DE]) [X] 5, 9-14, 17, 21, 26, 30-35, 38, 42, 45-47, 49 * Paragraphs 0019, 0023, 0037-0040, 0046-0047, 0068 *; | [X]EP3065432 (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-2, 4, 22-23, 25, 43-44, 49* Paragraphs 0014, 0055-0057 * | [X]US2011136482 (KALINER STEFAN [DE]); | [X]EP3065432 (APPLE INC [US]) | [A] - "Feasibility Study on the Security Aspects of Remote Provisioning and Change of Subscription for M2M Equipment; release 9", Technical Report TR 33.812, Sophia Antipolis, France, (20090600), page 23 [A] 0 * ; middle and bottom parts of page 18 * |