Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019530533 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615291913 | 12.10.2016 | WO2016US58073 | 21.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109843361B | Global Dossier | 12.05.2020 | B | CN109843361 | 04.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615291913 | 12.10.2016 | WO2016US58073 | 21.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3034862 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2019 | C | CA3034862 | 19.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615291913 | 12.10.2016 | WO2016US58073 | 21.10.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3525848 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2020 | A4 | EP3525848 | 21.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615291913 | 12.10.2016 | WO2016US58073 | 21.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018071049 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615291913 | 12.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10183124 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2019 | B2 | US2018099101 | 12.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615291913 | 12.10.2016 |