EP3525848 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ERGONOMIC NEEDLE PROTECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Repro-Med Systems, Inc. 24 Carpenter Road Chester, New York 10918 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEALFON, Andrew I. 23 Allison Road Monroe, New York 10950 / US | 02 /
GHESHMI, Siavash 203 Pine Hollow Way Chester, New York 10918 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16918944.6 | 21.10.2016 | [2019/34] | WO2016US58073 | Priority number, date | US201615291913 | 12.10.2016 Original published format: US201615291913 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018071049 | Date: | 19.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3525848 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/158 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A61M5/3202 (EP,US);
A61M5/3245 (US);
A61M5/158 (US);
A61M5/3213 (EP,US);
A61M5/3273 (US);
A61M2005/3246 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR ERGONOMISCHEN NADELSCHUTZ | [2019/34] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ERGONOMIC NEEDLE PROTECTOR | [2019/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'AIGUILLE ERGONOMIQUE | [2019/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 05.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3439675 (COHEN MARTIN BRUCE) [X] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP1344544 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7,13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0197]; figures 1-11 *; | [XI]US2004199112 (DALTON MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-6 * [I] 6,9; | [X]FR2906476 (BIOFRONT [FR]) [X] 1* figures 1-14 *; | [X]US2008097353 (CARR SUE [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figures 3,4 * | International search | [A]US5295963 (DEEKS DAVID J [AU]) [A] 1-55 * See claim 1; figures 1-8. *; | [A]US6585704 (LUTHER RONALD B [US], et al) [A] 1-55 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US6595965 (UTTERBERG DAVID S [US]) [A] 1-55* See the entire document. *; | [A]US2005038399 (SUZUKI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-55 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US7326189 (MORI TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 1-55 * See the entire document. * |