Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
09.08.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
09.08.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
15.07.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.05.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.05.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.05.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.05.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.04.2019 | Change - representative | |
26.04.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.06.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.05.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.05.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication |