EP3537702 - SELFIE STICK AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PHOTOGRAPHING DEVICE BY MEANS OF SELFIE STICK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Royole Technologies Co., Ltd. Room 320 Overseas High-Tech Venture Park 1, Qinglin West Road Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518172 / CN | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wenjun A4-1501 Kexing Science Park No.15 Keyuan Rd. Science and Technology Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16920610.9 | 04.11.2016 | [2019/37] | WO2016CN104714 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018082047 | Date: | 11.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537702 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
F16M11/28 (EP,US);
G03B17/561 (KR,US);
H04N23/66 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F16M11/04 (CN);
F16M11/041 (EP,US);
F16M11/06 (US);
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M13/00 (EP);
F16M13/04 (EP,CN,US);
G03B17/563 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (KR);
G06F3/0412 (US);
H04N23/62 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/632 (EP);
H05K1/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELFIE-STICK UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER FOTOGRAFISCHEN VORRICHTUNG MIT DEM SELFIE-STICK | [2019/37] | English: | SELFIE STICK AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING PHOTOGRAPHING DEVICE BY MEANS OF SELFIE STICK | [2019/37] | French: | PERCHE À SELFIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE PHOTOGRAPHIE AU MOYEN D'UNE PERCHE À SELFIE | [2019/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2019 | Translation filed | 26.04.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 22.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |