EP3541700 - A MANUALLY DETACHABLE LOCKING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xdynamics Limited Unit 216-217 Photonics Centre Science Park, Hong Kong / CN | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xinghua Number 513 12th Group Qun Xing Village Hu Jia Ying Town Nan Zheng County Hanzhong Shaanxi / CN | 02 /
CHAN, Man Wah 13/F, Block M5, 1 Babington Road Mid-Levels Hong Kong / CN | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | inCompass IP Europe Limited 51 Paddock Mead Harlow, Essex CM18 7RR / GB | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 16922001.9 | 17.11.2016 | [2019/39] | WO2016CN106229 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018090281 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3541700 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64C11/04, B64C27/14 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B64C11/04 (EP,US);
B64C27/48 (US);
B64U30/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | MANUELL LÖSBARER VERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2019/39] | English: | A MANUALLY DETACHABLE LOCKING MECHANISM | [2019/39] | French: | MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE MANUELLEMENT AMOVIBLE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 29.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB484553 (JOHN IVAR OLSSON); | [X]US3217746 (VOISINE LEO G); | [X]US2006099838 (MEYERS THOMAS A [AU]); | [X]CN105173072 (GUANGZHOU FEIMI ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al); | [X]CN205499359U (SHENZHEN AEE AVIATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |