Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018096654 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP85000 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10787985 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2020 | B2 | US2020141348 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP85000 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6562163B | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B2 | JPWO2018096654 | 21.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP85000 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3421764 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2020 | B1 | EP3421764 | 10.07.2019 | A4 | EP3421764 | 02.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP85000 | 25.11.2016 |