EP3421764 - COMBUSTION CONTROL DEVICE FOR COMPRESSION AUTOIGNITION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Kota c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
URUSHIHARA, Tomonori c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Atsushi c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
KAWAI, Yusuke c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
MIYAMOTO, Toru c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 06 /
KOSHIRO, Yudai c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 16922163.7 | 25.11.2016 | [2019/01] | WO2016JP85000 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018096654 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3421764 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3421764 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02D45/00, F02D41/04, F02D41/38, F02D43/00, F02P5/15, F02B11/00, F02D41/40, F02B1/12 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
F02D41/3041 (EP,US);
F02B23/10 (EP);
F02B3/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (US);
F02D41/009 (US);
F02D41/402 (EP,US);
F02F3/26 (US);
F02M61/14 (US);
F02P5/045 (US);
F02P5/15 (EP);
F02B1/04 (EP);
F02B1/12 (EP);
F02D2041/389 (US);
F02D41/0057 (EP);
F02D41/3047 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/01] | F02D45/00, F02D41/04, F02D41/38, F02D43/00, F02P5/15, F02B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERDICHTENDEN SELBSTZÜNDUNGSMOTOR | [2019/01] | English: | COMBUSTION CONTROL DEVICE FOR COMPRESSION AUTOIGNITION ENGINE | [2019/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMBUSTION DESTINÉ À UN MOTEUR À AUTO-ALLUMAGE PAR COMPRESSION | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2018 | Translation filed | 27.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 02.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2016 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | GB | 25.11.2020 | IE | 25.11.2020 | LU | 25.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | FR | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MK | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 25.11.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
FR | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 25.11.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1083324 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 3-6* paragraph [0031] *; | [XAI]US2002059914 (YAMAGUCHI KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0049] - [0082] * [A] 6 [I] 3,4; | [XI]JP2002188447 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0031] - [0037]; figures 3-5 * [I] 7; | [X]JP2002276368 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,8-12 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2003049691 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,9,10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0031] * [Y] 3-6; | [X]JP2003049651 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * * abstract *; | [X]JP2012241590 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1,9,10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0096] - [0105] *; | [E]EP3421763 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1-4,7-12 * paragraphs [0175] - [0205] * | International search | [YA]JP2012241590 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0096] to [0106], [0115] to [0120]; fig. 4, 8, 10 to 11, 13 (Family: none) * [A] 1-8; | [YA]JP2012246783 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 9 * , claims; paragraphs [0009] to [0016], [0021] to [0031], [0039] to [0054], [0059] to [0064], [0068] to [0075]; fig. 1, 3 to 5, 8 (Family: none) * [A] 1-8; | [A]JP5447423B (Mazda Motor Corp.) [A] 1-9* , entire text (Family: none) * |