EP3545343 - FORMABLE ANTI-GLARE POLYMER FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2020/38] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEIVARAJ, Theivanayagam Chairman Bergesweg 16 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KOSTROMINE, Serguei Allmende 8 53913 Swisttal / DE | 03 /
PETZOLDT, Joachim Iltisstrasse 2 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 04 /
BAYRAM, Nutkiye Flurstrasse 40 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
SCHEIBNER, Daniel Heinrichstrasse 26 50226 Frechen / DE | 06 /
WONG, Chung Leung Section B 2nd Street No. 1A Fairview Park Yuen Long N.T. Hong Kong / CN | 07 /
FENG, Meng Room 102 Building 24 No. 399 Baochun Road Minhang District Shanghai / CN | [2019/47] |
Former [2019/40] | 01 /
DEIVARAJ, Theivanayagam Chairman Bergesweg 16 D-40489 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
KOSTROMINE, Serguei Allmende 8 D-53913 Swisttal / DE | |||
03 /
PETZOLDT, Joachim Iltisstrasse 2 D-40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | |||
04 /
BAYRAM, Nutkiye Flurstrasse 40 D-51371 Leverkusen / DE | |||
05 /
SCHEIBNER, Daniel Heinrichstrasse 26 D-50226 Frechen / DE | |||
06 /
WONG, Chung Leung Section E 3rd Street No. 35 Fairview Park Yuen Long N.T. Hong Kong / CN | |||
07 /
FENG, Meng Room 102 Building 24 No. 399 Baochun Road Minhang District Shanghai / CN | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 16922349.2 | 23.11.2016 | [2019/40] | WO2016CN106902 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018094601 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545343 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3545343 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/11, G02B1/10, C09D175/14, C09D133/04 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/006 (KR);
C09D133/08 (KR,US);
C09D133/04 (EP);
C09D133/10 (KR);
C09D175/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F222/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMBARE BLENDSCHUTZPOLYMERFOLIEN | [2019/40] | English: | FORMABLE ANTI-GLARE POLYMER FILMS | [2019/40] | French: | FILMS POLYMÈRES ANTI-ÉBLOUISSEMENT FORMABLES | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 20.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2016 | AL | 30.03.2022 | AT | 30.03.2022 | CY | 30.03.2022 | CZ | 30.03.2022 | DK | 30.03.2022 | EE | 30.03.2022 | ES | 30.03.2022 | FI | 30.03.2022 | HR | 30.03.2022 | IT | 30.03.2022 | LT | 30.03.2022 | LV | 30.03.2022 | MC | 30.03.2022 | MK | 30.03.2022 | MT | 30.03.2022 | NL | 30.03.2022 | PL | 30.03.2022 | RO | 30.03.2022 | RS | 30.03.2022 | SE | 30.03.2022 | SI | 30.03.2022 | SK | 30.03.2022 | SM | 30.03.2022 | TR | 30.03.2022 | BG | 30.06.2022 | NO | 30.06.2022 | GR | 01.07.2022 | IS | 30.07.2022 | PT | 01.08.2022 | GB | 23.11.2022 | IE | 23.11.2022 | LU | 23.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | FR | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
TR | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
MK | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CY | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 30.03.2022 | ||
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
FR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
GB | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
LU | 23.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
MC | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SI | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
DK | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 30.03.2022 | |
AT | 30.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
IS | 30.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
PL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SK | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
CZ | 30.03.2022 | ||
EE | 30.03.2022 | ||
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 30.03.2022 | |
ES | 30.03.2022 | ||
FI | 30.03.2022 | ||
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RO | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
SM | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
PT | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
NL | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 30.03.2022 | |
HR | 30.03.2022 | ||
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
LV | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
GR | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 30.03.2022 | |
LT | 30.03.2022 | ||
RS | 30.03.2022 | ||
SE | 30.03.2022 | ||
BG | 30.06.2022 | ||
NO | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 30.03.2022 | |
NO | 30.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012141814 (PETZOLDT JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0008] - [0018] *; | [A]US2011080645 (TSUNO NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |