EP3545895 - MEDICAL PATH NAVIGATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND MEDICAL PATH PLANNING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changzhou Lunghealth Medtech Company Limited Building E2 No.9 Changyang Road Wujin District Changzhou Jiangsu 213145 / CN | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Hongyi Building E2 No. 9 Changyang Road Wujin District Changzhou Jiangsu 213145 / CN | 02 /
MA, Jiajun Building E2 No. 9 Changyang Road Wujin District Changzhou Jiangsu 213145 / CN | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Renaudo, Adrien Hanouar Patendibüroo Käosaar OÜ Tähe 94 50107 Tartu / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 16922382.3 | 30.12.2016 | [2019/40] | WO2016CN113824 | Priority number, date | CN20161142473 | 23.11.2016 Original published format: CN201611042473 | [2019/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018094847 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545895 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B34/10, A61B18/12, A61B90/00, // A61B17/00, A61B18/00 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,CN,US);
A61B18/12 (CN);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00809 (EP);
A61B2018/00023 (EP);
A61B2018/00541 (EP,CN);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00589 (CN);
A61B2018/1253 (EP,US);
A61B2018/126 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/40] | A61B34/20, A61B34/10, A61B18/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES WEGNAVIGATIONSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM SOWIE MEDIZINISCHES WEGPLANUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/40] | English: | MEDICAL PATH NAVIGATION METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND MEDICAL PATH PLANNING METHOD | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION SUR UN TRAJET MÉDICAL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION DE TRAJET MÉDICAL | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2019 | Translation filed | 20.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007293721 (GILBOA PINHAS [IL]); | [XI]US2012277763 (GREENBLATT ELLIOTT E [US], et al); | [XI]US2016005220 (WEINGARTEN OREN P [IL], et al); | [X]WO2016004000 (COVIDIEN LP [US]); | [A]US2016184013 (BRANNAN JOSEPH D [US], et al); | [A]WO2016131636 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) |