EP3544712 - FILTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bullfrog International, L.C. 7017 W 11800 South Herriman, UT 84096 / US | [2023/01] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Bullfrog International, L.C. 668 West 14600 South Bluffdale, UT 84065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALES, Eric 9217 Mount Airey Drive Eagle Mountain, Utah 84005 / US | 02 /
MCLANE, Mark, W. 217 W. 2125 N. Lehi, Utah 84043 / US | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Banse & Steglich Patentanwälte PartmbB Patentanwaltskanzlei Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23 80336 München / DE | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 16922512.5 | 22.12.2016 | [2019/40] | WO2016US68325 | Priority number, date | US201615361892 | 28.11.2016 Original published format: US201615361892 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018097848 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3544712 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3544712 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01D24/40, B01D29/03, B01D29/05, B01D29/11, B01D37/00, B01J8/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
B01D35/306 (EP,US);
B01D29/15 (US);
B01D29/21 (EP,US);
B01D35/143 (US);
B01D37/025 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/68 (EP,US);
E04H4/12 (US);
E04H4/1209 (EP,US);
B01D2201/0407 (US);
B01D2201/0415 (EP,US);
B01D2201/301 (US);
B01D2201/4046 (US);
B01D2201/4053 (EP,US);
B01D2201/4076 (EP,US);
B01D2201/4092 (US);
C02F2103/42 (EP,US);
C02F2201/006 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49604 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERSYSTEM | [2019/40] | English: | FILTER SYSTEM | [2019/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 30.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2016 | AL | 07.09.2022 | BG | 07.09.2022 | CY | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | IT | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | MK | 07.09.2022 | MT | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SE | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
BG | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
MK | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MC | 07.09.2022 | ||
MK | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
MK | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
IT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CY | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.12.2016 | |
AL | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 07.09.2022 | |
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SE | 07.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4921600 (MEISSNER PAUL J [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XY]US5211846 (KOTT LEONARD B [US], et al) [X] 1,10,13 * abstract * [Y] 2,5,7; | [XY]US2007241045 (KOTT LEONARD B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * [Y] 2,5,7; | [A]US2007241040 (KOTT LEONARD B [US], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]US2013228504 (MCELROY MARK ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 2,5,7 * figures 2a-2d * | International search | [Y]US5109651 (STUART JAMES F [US]) [Y] 1-3* , col 2, In 54 to col 12, In 32 *; | [Y]US5250179 (SPEARMAN MICHAEL R [US]) [Y] 1-3 * , col 1, In 44 to col 5, In 25 *; | [X]US5409606 (SPENCER TERREL [US]) [X] 1-3 * , Figs. 2, 3; col 3, In 7-12; col 5, In 1965; col 6, In 58-63; col 7, In 8-14 *; | [Y]US6739459 (HARTMANN THOMAS [US]) [Y] 1-3 * , col 1, In 63 to col 14, In 61 *; | [Y]US2004221381 (MATTSON ROY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * , para [0016][0124] * | Examination | US6217754 | US6325926 | US2012074052 | by applicant | US6217754 | US6325926 | US2007241045 | US2012074052 |