Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018107403 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN109963 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10827407 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | B2 | US2019297551 | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN109963 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110050483B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2020 | B | CN110050483 | 23.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN109963 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3547755 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2022 | B1 | EP3547755 | 20.11.2019 | A4 | EP3547755 | 02.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016CN109963 | 14.12.2016 |