EP3556724 - BEVERAGE DISCHARGE COCK, VALVE ROD, AND BEVERAGE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Group Holdings, Ltd. 23-1, Azumabashi 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8602 / JP | For all designated states Asahi Breweries, Ltd. 23-1, Azumabashi 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8602 / JP | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Tomohiro c/o ASAHI BREWERIES, LTD. Research & Development Laboratories for Packaging 1-21 Midori 1-chome Moriya-shi Ibaraki 302-0106 / JP | 02 /
KURABE, Yasuhiro c/o ASAHI BREWERIES, LTD. Research & Development Laboratories for Packaging 1-21 Midori 1-chome Moriya-shi Ibaraki 302-0106 / JP | 03 /
IMAI, Hirofumi c/o ACRITECH CORPORATION 1018 Kaneko Ohi-machi Asigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-0019 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAISHI, Kazuya c/o ACRITECH CORPORATION 1018 Kaneko Ohi-machi Asigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-0019 / JP | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/17] |
Former [2019/43] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16924113.0 | 13.12.2016 | [2019/43] | WO2016JP87038 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018109834 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3556724 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3556724 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B67D3/04, B67D1/12, B67D1/14 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
B67D1/145 (EP,KR);
B67D3/043 (KR);
B67D3/04 (US);
B67D1/04 (KR,RU,US);
B67D1/127 (RU);
B67D1/1275 (EP);
B67D1/1411 (EP,RU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | B67D1/04, B67D3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEAUSLAUFHAHN, VENTILSTANGE UND GETRÄNKESPENDER | [2019/43] | English: | BEVERAGE DISCHARGE COCK, VALVE ROD, AND BEVERAGE DISPENSER | [2019/43] | French: | ROBINET D'ÉVACUATION DE BOISSON, TIGE DE VALVE ET DISTRIBUTEUR DE BOISSON | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2019 | Translation filed | 10.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 14.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002332096 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2004175413 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2016179861 (KIRIN BREWERY) | International search | [A]JP2004175413 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-23* , 0009-0032, 1 - 6 () * | by applicant | JPH092590 |