EP3557017 - EXHAUST GAS AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEM FOR DIESEL ENGINE AND METHOD OF DETECTING ABNORMAL INJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/21] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2019/43] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yujiang 333 Fuquan Road North IBP Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | 02 /
LI, Ling 333 Fuquan Road North IBP Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Honglong 333 Fuquan Road North IBP Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | 04 /
DONG, Siwei 333 Fuquan RoadNorth IBP Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 16924169.2 | 16.12.2016 | [2019/43] | WO2016CN110379 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018107464 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3557017 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3557017 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.06.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/28, F01N3/20 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP);
F01N3/18 (US);
F01N11/00 (US);
F01N3/085 (US);
F01N3/28 (EP);
F01N9/007 (US);
F01N2550/00 (US);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2610/146 (EP);
F01N2900/0408 (EP);
F01N2900/0416 (EP);
F01N2900/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | F01N3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASNACHBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN DIESELMOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON ABNORMALER EINSPRITZUNG | [2019/43] | English: | EXHAUST GAS AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEM FOR DIESEL ENGINE AND METHOD OF DETECTING ABNORMAL INJECTION | [2019/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT POSTCOMBUSTION DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR DIESEL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'INJECTION ANORMALE | [2019/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2019 | Translation filed | 16.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/43] | 13.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2016 | AL | 26.05.2021 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | IT | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | RS | 26.05.2021 | SE | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | SM | 26.05.2021 | TR | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | GB | 16.12.2021 | IE | 16.12.2021 | LU | 16.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
TR | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 26.05.2021 | ||
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
GB | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 26.05.2021 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SM | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
RS | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2131021 (BOSCH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0054] - [0070]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2011083424 (WANG YUE-YUN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0026] - [0068]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO2014134273 (CUMMINS IP INC [US]) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0020] - [0055]; figures 1-4 * |