Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018116476 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP88563 | 22.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019323842 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP88563 | 22.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2018116476 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP88563 | 22.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3561452 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2020 | A4 | EP3561452 | 30.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP88563 | 22.12.2016 |